WY HB0050 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Chapter No. 197 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to a convention for proposing amendments to the United States constitution; specifying limitations on delegates to a United States constitution Article V convention; providing penalties for violation of oath; clarifying state convention refers to a state ratifying convention; modifying provisions relating to county conventions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limitations on delegates-constitution amendment conventions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-03 - Senate - Adopted HB0050JC001: 23-6-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Rescind original vote pursuant to HR 12-11:34-26-0-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Did Not Adopt HB0050JC001: 28-28-4-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Adopted HB0050JC001: 23-6-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0050JC001: 34-26-0-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Rescind original vote pursuant to HR 12-11 34-26-0-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Did Not Adopt HB0050JC001: 28-28-4-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - Concur:Failed 10-47-3-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - Concur:Failed 10-47-3-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 33-26-1-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 33-26-1-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 33-26-1-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-14 Chapter No. 197 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-14 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-14 Governor Signed HEA No. 0123
2017-03-03SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0123
2017-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0123
2017-03-03 Assigned Number HEA No. 0123
2017-03-03SenateAdopted HB0050JC001: 23-6-1-0-0
2017-03-03HouseAdopted HB0050JC001: 34-26-0-0-0
2017-03-03 Rescind original vote pursuant to HR 12-11:34-26-0-0-0
2017-03-03HouseDid Not Adopt HB0050JC001: 28-28-4-0-0
2017-03-03SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2017-03-03HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2017-03-02HouseConcur:Failed 10-47-3-0-0
2017-03-01HouseReceived for Concurrence
2017-03-01Senate3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0
2017-02-28Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-27SenateCOW:Passed
2017-02-14SenatePlaced on General File
2017-02-14SenateS03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2017-02-06SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
2017-01-23SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-01-20House3rd Reading:Passed 33-26-1-0-0
2017-01-19House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-01-18HouseCOW:Passed
2017-01-17HousePlaced on General File
2017-01-17HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2017-01-09HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-12-19 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback