WY HB0048 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; amending the elements of the crime of voyeurism; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voyeurism-amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - Did Not Adopt HB0048JC001: 1-58-1-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - House - Concur:Failed 3-55-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-4-2-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12Senatepostponed indefinitely
2020-03-12SenatePursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members
2020-03-11HousePursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members
2020-03-09SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-06HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-06HouseConcur:Failed 3-55-2-0-0
2020-03-05HouseReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-05Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2020-03-04Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-03SenateCOW:Passed
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on General File
2020-03-02SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2020-02-19SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-19House3rd Reading:Passed 54-4-2-0-0
2020-02-18House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-17HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-14HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-14HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 58-1-1-0-0
2020-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-01-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback