WY HB0047 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water; providing for senate confirmation of gubernatorial appointees of commissioners on interstate water compacts; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Senate confirmation of water compact commissioners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-18 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 1-8-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2019-01-18 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 1-8-0-0-0 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-28 | Bill Number Assigned |