WY HB0046 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to handicapped parking; specifying the size and marking of handicapped parking spaces; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Handicapped parking-space size and marking.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Rep. Rita Campbell [R] | Sen. Bernadine Craft [D] | Rep. Ken Esquibel [D] |
Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] | Rep. Clarence Vranish [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - H08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - H08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H08 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H08 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - H08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - H08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H08 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H08 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2012-03-08 | Governor SignedHEA0040 | |
2012-03-08 | (S) President Signed HEA No. 0040 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0040 | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned Number HEA0040 | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Did Concur | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Received for Concurrence | |
2012-03-07 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-03-05 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-03-02 | (S08) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-29 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S08 | |
2012-02-29 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-28 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-24 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-17 | (H08) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H08 | |
2012-02-13 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-02 | Bill Number Assigned |