WY HB0043 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-19 - COW:Failed 23-38-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-19 - COW:Failed 23-38-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to highways; striking the requirement to willfully fail to observe a road closure notification necessary to be guilty of the criminal offense; increasing the fine amount for failing to observe road closure notifications; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Winter road closures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-19 - House - COW:Failed 23-38-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-01-19 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-19 | House | COW:Failed 23-38-1-0-0 |
2023-01-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-19 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2023-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2023-01-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-12 | Bill Number Assigned |