WY HB0040 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to administration of government; providing boards of cooperative educational services an option to participate in the state employees' and officials' group insurance plan; modifying provisions relating to voluntary participation by nonstate employers; specifying participation and contribution requirements and procedures and implementing payment mechanisms for participating boards; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State employees' and officials' group insurance-membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H02 (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H02 (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H02 (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H02 (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2014-03-04 | Governor Signed HEA0003 | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0003 |
2014-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0003 |
2014-02-26 | Assigned Number HEA0003 | |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-12 | House | Passed CoW |
2014-02-12 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-12 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-12 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2014-02-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 |
2014-02-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-01-13 | Bill Number Assigned |