WY HB0035 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to environmental quality; requiring the environmental quality council to promulgate rules no more stringent than federal law, rules or regulations; providing exceptions; specifying applicability; requiring rulemaking; requiring reporting; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Limitation on environmental rulemaking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-2-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-4-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 59-1-2-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-4-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 59-1-2-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Assigned Chapter Number 22 | |
2024-03-05 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0016 | |
2024-03-01 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0016 |
2024-02-29 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0016 |
2024-02-29 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0016 | |
2024-02-29 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-2-0-0 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-27 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-26 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-21 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-4-0-0-0 |
2024-02-20 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-19 | House | COW:Passed |
2024-02-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2024-02-16 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 59-1-2-0-0 |
2024-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-01-03 | Bill Number Assigned |