WY HB0035 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 90 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to insurance; regulating the provision of pharmacy benefits; requiring licensure of pharmacy benefit managers; establishing a licensing fee; providing definitions; requiring the promulgation of rules; providing requirements for audits conducted by pharmacy benefit managers; providing requirements for drug maximum allowable cost lists; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy benefit manager regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-14-1-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-14-1-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-14-1-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 90 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed HEA No. 0018
2016-03-01SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0018
2016-02-29HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0018
2016-02-29 Assigned Number HEA No. 0018
2016-02-29Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-26Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-25SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-25SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-25 S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2016-02-19SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-18House3rd Reading:Passed 45-14-1-0-0
2016-02-17House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-16HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-12HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-11 H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2016-02-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 59-0-1-0-0
2016-02-05HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-01-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback