WY HB0031 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; authorizing a board of cooperative educational services to act as a local education agency for the purpose of applying for and receiving state and federal grants; authorizing rulemaking; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
BOCES as local education agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-1-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:S Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 16-14-1-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 14-16-1-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-15 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-14-2-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:S Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 16-14-1-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 14-16-1-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-15 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-14-2-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | Assigned Chapter Number 82 | |
2023-02-24 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0038 | |
2023-02-22 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0038 |
2023-02-21 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0038 |
2023-02-17 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0038 | |
2023-02-17 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-1-0-0 |
2023-02-17 | Senate | 3rd Reading:S Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 16-14-1-0-0 |
2023-02-17 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 14-16-1-0-0 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-15 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 46-14-2-0-0 |
2023-01-18 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-17 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-16 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-2-0-0 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2023-01-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-09 | Bill Number Assigned |