WY HB0031 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - President Signed HEA No. 0030
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Hathaway scholarship program; extending the deadline to apply for the scholarship; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hathaway scholarship application deadline- extension.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 32-26-2-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0030
2018-03-08HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0030
2018-03-07 Assigned Number HEA No. 0030
2018-03-07Senate3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0
2018-03-06Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2018-03-05SenateCOW:Passed
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on General File
2018-03-02SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2018-02-28SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2018-02-27SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-02-27House3rd Reading:Passed 32-26-2-0-0
2018-02-23House2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-22HouseCOW:Passed
2018-02-22HousePlaced on General File
2018-02-22HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
2018-02-15HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education 43-16-1-0-0
2018-02-09HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-12-29 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback