WY HB0030 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to utilities; increasing the maximum utility assessment as specified; conforming provisions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public utility assessment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - Concur:Passed 35-23-2-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-21-0-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - Amendment failed 22-38-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-29 - House - Amendment failed 30-30-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09 Assigned Chapter Number 19
2021-02-09 Governor Signed HEA No. 0013
2021-02-05SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0013
2021-02-05HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0013
2021-02-04 Assigned Number HEA No. 0013
2021-02-04HouseConcur:Passed 35-23-2-0-0
2021-02-04HouseReceived for Concurrence
2021-02-04Senate3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0
2021-02-03Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2021-02-02SenateCOW:Passed
2021-02-02SenatePlaced on General File
2021-02-02SenateS03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2021-02-01SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
2021-02-01SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-02-01House3rd Reading:Passed 39-21-0-0-0
2021-01-29House2nd Reading:Passed
2021-01-28HouseCOW:Passed
2021-01-27HousePlaced on General File
2021-01-27HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2021-01-12HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-12-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0030
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Introduced/HB0030.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Engross/HB0030.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Enroll/HB0030.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0030HS001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0030HW001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0030H2001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0030H2002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0030H3001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0030SS001.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Fiscal/HB0030.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Summaries/HB0030.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0030#-6
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0030#5029
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0030#5037
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0030#5038
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0030#-131
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0030#149
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0030#5077

Bill Comments 750

feedback