WY HB0030 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - No report prior to CoW Cutoff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - No report prior to CoW Cutoff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to school finance; requiring school districts to comply with department of workforce services programs as specified; requiring the average daily membership calculation within the school district funding model to be calculated at the school district level; revising workers' compensation provisions for special education professionals; prohibiting school districts from leasing buses; amending provisions regarding school bus purchase reimbursements; amending school district funding for groundskeepers; repealing funding to school districts for assessments; requiring a report; requiring the department of education to establish special education staffing guidelines as required by existing statute; and providing for effective dates.
Title
School finance amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 49-11-0-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 49-11-0-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-12-29 | Bill Number Assigned |