WY HB0028 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - President Signed HEA No. 0029
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - President Signed HEA No. 0029
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education accountability; providing for performance reporting for students with a parent or guardian who is a military member; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Education reporting-children of military personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-28-1-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-28-1-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0029 |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0029 |
2018-03-07 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0029 | |
2018-03-07 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 24-5-1-0-0 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-05 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-03-02 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-28-1-0-0 |
2018-02-16 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2018-02-15 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-14 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-13 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-13 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 43-16-1-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-12-29 | Bill Number Assigned |