WY HB0028 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-05 - (H) Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-05 - (H) Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to Wyoming Firearms Freedom Act, establishing a Wyoming Firearms Freedom Act; providing definitions; providing that specified firearms that are manufactured, sold, purchased, possessed and used exclusively within Wyoming shall be exempt from federal regulation, including registration requirements; providing exceptions; providing legislative findings and declaration of authority; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming Firearms Freedom Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Anderson [R] | Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Rep. Richard Cannady [R] | Sen. Cale Case [R] |
Sen. Stan Cooper [R] | Rep. Kathy Davison [R] | Rep. Amy Edmonds [R] | Rep. Peter Illoway [R] |
Sen. Kit Jennings [R] | Rep. David Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-05 | (H) Died In Committee | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H01; No Report Prior to COW Cutoff; Intro Vote | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-01-06 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Digest/HB0028.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Introduced/HB0028.pdf |