WY HB0025 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Assigned Chapter Number 88
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Assigned Chapter Number 88
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to local sales and use tax; authorizing the deposit of certain specific purpose excise taxes into reserve accounts as specified; requiring approval from the governing body and qualified electors of a county; specifying the use of funds in reserve accounts; and providing for an effective date.
Title
County reserve accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - Concur:Passed 48-10-2-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-11-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 17-12-1-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 6-22-2-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-14-0-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 46-13-1-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-11-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 17-12-1-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 6-22-2-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-14-0-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 46-13-1-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Assigned Chapter Number 88 | |
2020-03-13 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0049 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0049 |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0049 |
2020-03-09 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0049 | |
2020-03-09 | House | Concur:Passed 48-10-2-0-0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2020-03-09 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 18-11-1-0-0 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 17-12-1-0-0 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 6-22-2-0-0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-03-03 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-20 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 46-14-0-0-0 |
2020-02-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2020-02-18 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-17 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-14 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 46-13-1-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-12-16 | Bill Number Assigned |