WY HB0025 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Assigned Chapter Number 18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Assigned Chapter Number 18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to virtual education; modifying who may teach virtual education courses; modifying where a full-time virtual education student may be enrolled; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Virtual education amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Assigned Chapter Number 18 | |
2019-02-14 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0005 | |
2019-02-11 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0005 |
2019-02-11 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0005 |
2019-02-08 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0005 | |
2019-02-08 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-04 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-15 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2019-01-14 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-11 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-10 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-10 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-18 | Bill Number Assigned |