WY HB0025 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to embalmers, funeral directors, undertakers and crematories; creating the board of funeral service practitioners; providing for regulation of funeral service practitioners and establishments; providing for licensure; providing for fees; providing penalties; providing for regulation of disposition of human remains; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Funeral Service Practitioners Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H07 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H07 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2014-03-06 | Governor Signed HEA0021 | |
2014-03-03 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0021 |
2014-03-03 | Assigned Number HEA0021 | |
2014-02-28 | House | Did Concur |
2014-02-28 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2014-02-26 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed CoW |
2014-02-14 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-14 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-14 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-13 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 |
2014-02-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-01-05 | Bill Number Assigned |