WY HB0025 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - President Signed HEA No. 0046
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - President Signed HEA No. 0046
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to pari-mutuel wagering; distinguishing between live and simulcast racing in definitions; redefining simulcasting; providing for disbursal of fees; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Simulcasting of pari-mutuel events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-21 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0046 |
2013-02-20 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0046 |
2013-02-19 | Assigned Number HEA0046 | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-23 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-22 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-22 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-17 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 |
2013-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2012-11-30 | Bill Number Assigned |