WY HB0023 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to school districts; clarifying that procurement activities by a school district that are conducted through a board of cooperative educational services are subject to publication and competitive bidding requirements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School district procurement amendment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-0-0-1 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-5-2-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-5-2-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Assigned Chapter Number 21 | |
2020-03-09 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0015 | |
2020-03-05 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0015 |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0015 |
2020-03-04 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0015 | |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-0-0-1 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-02 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-27 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-17 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 53-5-2-0-0 |
2020-02-14 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-13 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-12 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 59-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-12-11 | Bill Number Assigned |