WY HB0023 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 86 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 86 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the secretary of state; modifying time period, publication and notice requirements relating to business entities; amending requirements for the secretary of state to publish certain documents; removing requirement for the secretary of state to distribute copies of the election code to county clerks; accordingly repealing the requirement that county clerks distribute copies of election code to election judges; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Secretary of state's office-amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-3-2-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-3-2-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-3-2-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-3-2-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Chapter No. 86 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-06 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0048 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0048 |
2017-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0048 |
2017-02-22 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0048 | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-14 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-09 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-25 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 55-3-2-0-0 |
2017-01-24 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-23 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-19 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-17 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-17 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-09 | Bill Number Assigned |