WY HB0022 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 84
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; modifying provisions governing teacher accountability; conforming provisions; repealing provisions regarding teacher and school leader accountability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher accountability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Adopted HB0022JC001: 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Adopted HB0022JC001: 54-0-6-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Concur:Failed 3-56-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Amendment adopted 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 84
2019-02-26 Governor Signed HEA No. 0061
2019-02-21SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0061
2019-02-21HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0061
2019-02-20 Assigned Number HEA No. 0061
2019-02-12SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-12HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-12HouseConcur:Failed 3-56-1-0-0
2019-02-11HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-11Senate3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0
2019-02-08Senate3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-07Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-06Senate2nd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-05SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-04SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-04SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2019-01-25SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23House3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0
2019-01-22House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-18HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-18HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-17HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-17HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-12-18 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback