WY HB0021 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state lands; requiring an applicant to have actual and necessary use of state lands to be qualified to lease state lands; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State lands-use of land qualification requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - House - Concur:Passed 61-1-0-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-0-0-2 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-0-0-2 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | Assigned Chapter Number 81 | |
2023-02-24 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0035 | |
2023-02-22 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0035 |
2023-02-21 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0035 |
2023-02-16 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0035 | |
2023-02-16 | House | Concur:Passed 61-1-0-0-0 |
2023-02-15 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2023-02-15 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-0-0-2 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-13 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-13 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-26 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 |
2023-01-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-19 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2023-01-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-06 | Bill Number Assigned |