WY HB0019 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Assigned Chapter Number 85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Assigned Chapter Number 85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to cities and towns; authorizing franchise fee agreements for access to public rights-of-way; providing limitations on franchise fee agreements as specified; providing exceptions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Municipal right-of-way franchise fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - Concur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Assigned Chapter Number 85 | |
2020-03-13 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0047 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0047 |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0047 |
2020-03-09 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0047 | |
2020-03-09 | House | Concur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2020-03-06 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2020-03-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-03-03 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-14 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 |
2020-02-13 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-12 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-11 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-11 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 59-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-12-11 | Bill Number Assigned |