WY HB0019 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - President Signed HEA No. 0001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - President Signed HEA No. 0001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to trade and commerce; amending the Wyoming Money Transmitter Act to provide an exemption for virtual currency; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming Money Transmitter Act-virtual currency exemption.
Sponsors
Rep. David Miller [R] | Sen. Dennis Biteman [R] | Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. Scott Clem [R] |
Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] | Sen. Eli Bebout [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0001 |
2018-03-05 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0001 |
2018-03-02 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0001 | |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-28 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-23 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-15 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-14 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 59-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-12-18 | Bill Number Assigned |