WY HB0018 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Assigned Chapter Number 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Assigned Chapter Number 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to missing person alert systems; amending duties for the office of homeland security and highway patrol for emergency alert communications networks; amending state cooperation with federal, tribal and local law enforcement for alert systems; providing a definition; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Missing person alert systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - House - Concur:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-2-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-2-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | Assigned Chapter Number 45 | |
2023-02-21 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0020 | |
2023-02-16 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0020 |
2023-02-15 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0020 |
2023-02-15 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0020 | |
2023-02-14 | House | Concur:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 |
2023-02-13 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2023-02-13 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-08 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-07 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-2-0-0 |
2023-01-18 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-17 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-17 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2023-01-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-05 | Bill Number Assigned |