WY HB0017 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the military department; creating a fund for the deposit of monies from grazing fees at military training areas; authorizing the adjutant general to administer the fund and expend monies for range management and grazing operations; requiring annual reports; providing for a continuous appropriation; providing for an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Range management at military training areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Concur:Passed 45-15-0-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-22-0-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-22-0-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Assigned Chapter Number 121 | |
2021-04-06 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0068 | |
2021-04-02 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0068 |
2021-04-01 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0068 |
2021-04-01 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0068 | |
2021-04-01 | House | Concur:Passed 45-15-0-0-0 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2021-03-31 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-25 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-23 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-08 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 38-22-0-0-0 |
2021-03-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-01-28 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-01-28 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2021-01-27 | House | H08 - Transportation:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2021-01-27 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2021-01-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-12-21 | Bill Number Assigned |