WY HB0016 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 120
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 120
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state lands; increasing the monetary threshold for improvements to leased state lands that do not require permission of the director of the office of state lands; replacing the standard to determine payment for the use and benefit of improvements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State land leasing-improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - Senate - Adopted HB0016JC001: 27-2-0-0-2 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Adopted HB0016JC001: 61-1-0-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - Concur:Failed 0-61-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-0-0-2 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-2-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-12 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Adopted HB0016JC001: 61-1-0-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - Concur:Failed 0-61-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-0-0-2 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-2-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-12 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Assigned Chapter Number 120 | |
2023-02-27 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0059 | |
2023-02-23 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0059 |
2023-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0059 |
2023-02-22 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0059 | |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2023-02-14 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2023-02-14 | House | Concur:Failed 0-61-1-0-0 |
2023-02-13 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2023-02-13 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-0-0-2 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-08 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-08 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-17 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-2-0-0 |
2023-01-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-13 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-12 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2023-01-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-05 | Bill Number Assigned |