WY HB0014 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - COW:Bill Reconsideration Motion Failed by Roll Call 15-15-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - COW:Bill Reconsideration Motion Failed by Roll Call 15-15-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to legal time; requiring an application for the state to transfer time zones as specified; establishing a new uniform state time; making legislative findings; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Mountain daylight time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - COW:Bill Reconsideration Motion Failed by Roll Call 15-15-0-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - COW:Failed 15-15-0-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-01 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 35-23-2-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-0-1-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - COW:Failed 15-15-0-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-01 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 35-23-2-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-0-1-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | COW:Bill Reconsideration Motion Failed by Roll Call 15-15-0-0-0 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | COW:Failed 15-15-0-0-0 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-01 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-28 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 35-23-2-0-0 |
2019-01-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-22 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-0-1-0 |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-14 | Bill Number Assigned |