WY HB0014 | 2014 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to business entities; repealing filing fees for statements of change of registered agent or registered office; increasing fee for certificates of authority; providing a filing fee for conversions; repealing duplicative provision for penalties for false filings; providing for update of registered agent information for limited liability partnerships; providing for administrative forfeiture of limited liability companies' authority to do business for failure to update registered agent information; limiting information required for articles of continuance by a foreign organization; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business entities-revisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-03 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H07 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-11 Assigned Chapter Number
2014-03-10 Governor Signed HEA No. 0035
2014-03-04SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0035
2014-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0035
2014-03-03 Assigned Number HEA No. 0035
2014-03-03HouseDid Concur
2014-03-03HouseReceived for Concurrence
2014-03-03SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-28SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-27SenatePassed COW
2014-02-27SenatePlaced on General File
2014-02-27SenateRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2014-02-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07
2014-02-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2014-02-24HousePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-21HousePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-20HousePassed COW
2014-02-18HousePlaced on General File
2014-02-18HouseRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07
2014-02-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-12-18 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback