WY HB0013 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to livestock and other animals; revising the process for licensure of livestock markets as specified; revising the responsibilities and fines for estrays; revising the penalty for stock and exotic livestock running at large; providing other technical changes as specified; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Livestock revisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-11 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-11 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2013-02-15 | Governor Signed HEA0032 | |
2013-02-13 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0032 |
2013-02-13 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0032 |
2013-02-12 | Assigned Number HEA0032 | |
2013-02-12 | House | Did Concur |
2013-02-11 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-07 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-16 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-15 | House | Laid Back Pursuant to HR 7-3 |
2013-01-14 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-14 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-11 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-11 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-11 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-11 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-11 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-11 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 |
2013-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2012-11-30 | Bill Number Assigned |