WY HB0010 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-08 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-08 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to insurance; requiring language to be included in a certificate of insurance; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Certificates of insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-08 - Senate - S Failed CoW; Indef Postponed (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-08 | Senate | Failed CoW; Indef Postponed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-14 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-14 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-14 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 |
2013-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2012-11-28 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0010.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/HB0010.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0010.htm |