WY HB0007 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - Assigned Chapter Number 73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - Assigned Chapter Number 73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to domestic relations; amending the minimum marriageable age; specifying that marriages involving persons under age sixteen (16) are void; making conforming amendments; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Underage marriage-amendments.
Sponsors
Rep. Ember Oakley [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Sen. Cale Case [R] | Sen. Dan Furphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - Concur:Passed 40-21-1-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-25-1-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-25-1-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | Assigned Chapter Number 73 | |
2023-02-23 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0044 | |
2023-02-22 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0044 |
2023-02-21 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0044 |
2023-02-17 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0044 | |
2023-02-17 | House | Concur:Passed 40-21-1-0-0 |
2023-02-17 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2023-02-16 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-1-0-0 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2023-02-14 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-13 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2023-02-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-09 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-20 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 36-25-1-0-0 |
2023-01-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-17 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2023-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2023-01-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-11-30 | Bill Number Assigned |