WY HB0007 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - President Signed HEA No. 0109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public health and safety; repealing archaic provisions requiring motion picture operators to provide running water and flush toilet facilities; repealing related provisions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sanitary facilities for motion picture operators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-26 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0109
2013-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0109
2013-02-26 Assigned Number HEA0109
2013-02-26SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-25SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-22SenatePassed CoW
2013-02-07SenatePlaced on General File
2013-02-07SenateRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S06
2013-01-16SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-01-16HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-01-15HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-01-14HousePassed CoW
2013-01-14HousePlaced on General File
2013-01-14HouseRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06
2013-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2012-11-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback