WY HB0004 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - President Signed HEA No. 0007
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - President Signed HEA No. 0007
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public funds; clarifying conditions on the investment of permanent and pool A account funds in equities; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Investment of state funds-amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-8-0-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-8-0-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0007 |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0007 |
2018-03-05 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0007 | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-27 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 52-8-0-0-0 |
2018-02-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-15 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-14 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 60-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-12-06 | Bill Number Assigned |