WY HB0001 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - See Mirror Bill SF0001
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to make appropriations for the fiscal biennium commencing July 1, 2020 and ending June 30, 2022; providing definitions; providing for appropriations and transfers of funds for the period of the budget and for the remainder of the current biennium as specified; providing for carryover of certain funds beyond the biennium as specified; providing for employee positions as specified; providing for duties, terms and conditions and other requirements relating to appropriations for the remainder of the current biennium and the period of the budget as specified; providing for position and other budgetary limitations; amending existing law by redirecting revenues and making transfers for the period of the budget; providing for reports related to appropriations; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General government appropriations-2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - Amendment adopted 31-29-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - Amendment adopted 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - Amendment adopted 34-26-0-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - Amendment failed 16-43-1-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - House - Amendment adopted 38-21-1-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - Amendment adopted 33-26-1-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - Amendment adopted 38-22-0-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - Amendment adopted 45-15-0-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - Amendment adopted 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - Amendment adopted 37-23-0-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - Amendment adopted 41-19-0-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - Amendment adopted 39-21-0-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - Amendment failed 29-31-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - Amendment adopted 32-28-0-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - Amendment adopted 32-27-1-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - Amendment adopted 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseSee Mirror Bill SF0001
2020-02-25SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-02-25SenateSenate:Pursuant to JR 14-1 (g) referred directly to JCC
2020-02-25SenateSenate:Pursuant to JR 14-1 (f) referred directly to 3rd Reading
2020-02-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02
2020-02-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-21House3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0
2020-02-19House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-18HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-18HouseCOW:Considered
2020-02-17HouseIntroduced and Referred to HCOW
2020-02-14HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0001
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Introduced/HB0001.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Fiscal/HB0001.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0001#5291
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0001#5292
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0001#5293
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0001#5294
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0001#5295
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0001#5296
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0001#5297
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0001#5299
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0001#5308
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0001#5309
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0001#5310
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0001#5311
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0001#5312
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0001#5313
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0001#5314
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0001#5315
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0001#5316

Bill Comments

feedback