WY HB0001 | 2012 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - (H) See Mirrored bill SF0001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to make appropriations for the biennium commencing July 1, 2012, and ending June 30, 2014; providing definitions; providing for appropriations and transfers of funds during that biennium and for the remainder of the current biennium as specified; providing for funding for carryover of certain funds beyond the biennium as specified; providing for employee positions as specified; providing for fees, conditions and other requirements relating to appropriations; providing for position and other budgetary limitations; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General government appropriations-2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-27 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - Amendment Adopted (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - Amendment Adopted (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - Amendment Adopted (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - Amendment Adopted (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - Amendment Adopted (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - Amendment Adopted (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - Amendment Adopted (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - Amendment Adopted (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - Amendment Adopted (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - Amendment Adopted (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - Amendment Adopted (Y: 13 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - House - Amendment Adopted (Y: 13 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - H Failed Section 318 CoW (Y: 13 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
1969-12-31 - House - (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-06 (H) See Mirrored bill SF0001
2012-03-01 Pursuant to JR 14-1(h)(1) referred directly to JCC
2012-03-01 Amendment Adopted
2012-03-01 (S) Amendments Adopted
2012-03-01 Pursuant to JR 14-1(f) referred directly to Third Reading
2012-02-28 (S) Introduced and Referred to S02
2012-02-28 (S) Received for Introduction
2012-02-27 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-02-27 Amendment Failed
2012-02-27 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-27 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-27 Amendment Failed
2012-02-27 Amendment Failed
2012-02-27 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-27 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-27 Amendment Failed
2012-02-27 Amendment Failed
2012-02-27 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-27 Amendment Failed
2012-02-27 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-27 Amendment Failed
2012-02-27 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-27 Amendment Failed
2012-02-27 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-27 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-27 Amendment Failed
2012-02-27 Amendment Failed
2012-02-27 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-27 Amendment Failed
2012-02-27 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-27 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-27 Amendment Failed
2012-02-27 Amendment Failed
2012-02-27 Amendment Failed
2012-02-27 Amendment Failed
2012-02-27 Amendment Failed
2012-02-27 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-27 Amendment Failed
2012-02-27 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-27 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-24 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-02-24 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Failed
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Failed
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Failed
2012-02-23 Amendment Failed
2012-02-23 Amendment Failed
2012-02-23 Amendment Failed
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Failed
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Failed
2012-02-23 Amendment Failed
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Failed
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Failed
2012-02-23 Amendment Failed
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Failed
2012-02-23 Amendment Failed
2012-02-23 Amendment Failed
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 (H) Amendments Adopted
2012-02-22 (H) Passed CoW
2012-02-22 (H) Failed Section 318 CoW
2012-02-21 (H) Considered in CoW
2012-02-21 (H) Introduced and Referred to COW
2012-02-16 (H) Received for Introduction
2012-02-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback