WV SJR6 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-08 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-08 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this resolution is to provide for the improvement and construction of safe roads in the state.
Title
Roads to Prosperity Amendment of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and adopted resolution (Roll No. 473) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - Adopted by House (Roll No. 567) (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 566) (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 467) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 299) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - Adopted by House (Roll No. 567) (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 566) (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 467) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 299) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | Adopted by House (Roll No. 567) |
2017-04-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 566) |
2017-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and adopted resolution (Roll No. 473) |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-07 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 467) |
2017-04-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-04-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | With amendment, be adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-04-03 | House | With amendment, be adopted, but first to Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | House | To House Finance |
2017-03-30 | House | To Finance then Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 299) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Having been read 1st time 3/25/17 |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Finance on 2nd reading |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Motion |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Committee sub for committee sub reported, but first to Finance |
2017-03-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-23 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HJR22 (Similar To) 2017-03-06 - To House Finance