WV SCR76 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House Message received
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House Message received
Summary
Requesting Division of Highways place sign at Fayetteville, Fayette County, "Coolest Small Town"
Title
Requesting Division of Highways place sign at Fayetteville, Fayette County, "Coolest Small Town"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-08 | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-08 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2008-03-08 | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar | |
2008-03-08 | Be adopted | |
2008-03-06 | To House Rules | |
2008-03-06 | To Rules | |
2008-03-06 | Introduced in House | |
2008-03-06 | Ordered to House | |
2008-03-06 | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-06 | On Unfinished Business | |
2008-03-05 | Reported be adopted | |
2008-03-04 | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2008-03-04 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-04 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-03-04 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-03-04 | Filed for introduction |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Resolution_History.cfm?year=2008&sessiontype=RS&input4=76&billtype=CR&houseorig=S&btype=res |