WV SCR63 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-09 - To House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-09 - To House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting Federal Pell Grant Program
Title
Supporting Federal Pell Grant Program
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Edgell [D] | Sen. Dan Foster [D] | Sen. Evan Jenkins [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] |
Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. John Unger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | To House Rules | |
2012-03-09 | To Rules | |
2012-03-09 | Introduced in House | |
2012-03-08 | Ordered to House | |
2012-03-08 | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-08 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-03-08 | Reported be adopted | |
2012-03-06 | To Education | |
2012-03-06 | On Unfinished Business | |
2012-03-05 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Filed for introduction |