WV SCR59 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-14 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-14 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Joint Committee on Government and Finance study expansion of outcomes of MU Luke Lee Listening, Language and Learning Lab
Title
Requesting Joint Committee on Government and Finance study expansion of outcomes of MU Luke Lee Listening, Language and Learning Lab
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-14 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-14 | House | Adopted by House (Voice vote) |
2015-03-14 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2015-03-14 | House | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-14 | House | Be adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | To House Rules |
2015-03-13 | House | To Rules |
2015-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2015-03-09 | Senate | To Rules |
2015-03-09 | Senate | To Rules |
2015-03-09 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2015-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |