WV SCR53 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-12 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-12 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Harry C. "Buck" Markley, Jr. Memorial Bridge
Title
Harry C. "Buck" Markley, Jr. Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-12 | House | Adopted by House (Voice vote) |
2016-03-12 | House | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-12 | House | Be adopted |
2016-03-09 | House | To House Rules |
2016-03-09 | House | To Rules |
2016-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2016-02-29 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2016-02-29 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2016-02-28 | Senate | Laid over on Unfinished Business 2/28/16 |
2016-02-28 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |