WV SCR53 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on March 7 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House Message received
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on March 7 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House Message received
Summary
Requesting Joint Committee on Government and Finance study convention and visitors bureaus
Title
Requesting Joint Committee on Government and Finance study convention and visitors bureaus
Sponsors
Sen. Billy Bailey [D] | Sen. Clark Barnes [R] | Sen. Donna Boley [R] | Sen. Edwin Bowman [D] |
Sen. Dan Foster [D] | Sen. Evan Jenkins [D] | Del. Melvin Kessler [D] | Sen. Joseph Minard [D] |
Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Randy White [D] |
Sen. John Yoder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-07 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-07 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-07 | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-07 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2008-03-07 | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar | |
2008-03-06 | Be adopted | |
2008-02-29 | To House Rules | |
2008-02-29 | To Rules | |
2008-02-29 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-29 | Ordered to House | |
2008-02-29 | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2008-02-29 | On Unfinished Business | |
2008-02-28 | Reported be adopted | |
2008-02-18 | Referred to Rules | |
2008-02-18 | Motion | |
2008-02-18 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-18 | Reported be adopted | |
2008-02-18 | Originating in Senate Government Organization |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Resolution_History.cfm?year=2008&sessiontype=RS&input4=53&billtype=CR&houseorig=S&btype=res |