WV SCR50 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-08 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-08 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting DOH name portion of State Rt. 20, Hinton, Summers County, "Marine Sgt. Mecot E. Camara Memorial Highway"
Title
Requesting DOH name portion of State Rt. 20, Hinton, Summers County, "USMC Sgt. Mecot E. Camara Memorial Highway"
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Miller [D] | Sen. William Laird [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Evan Jenkins [D] |
Sen. Mike Green [D] | Sen. William Cole [R] | Sen. John Unger [D] | Sen. Erik Wells [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - House - Adopted by House (Roll No. 351) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-08 | House | Adopted by House (Roll No. 351) |
2014-03-08 | House | Immediate consideration |
2014-03-08 | House | Be adopted |
2014-03-05 | House | To House Rules |
2014-03-05 | House | To Rules |
2014-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2014-02-25 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2014-02-25 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |