WV SCR40 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
US Army CPL Roy E. Clark Memorial Bridge
Title
US Army CPL Roy E. Clark Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Tarr [R] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] | Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
Sen. Chandler Swope [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and adopted resolution |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2019-03-09 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-09 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2019-03-09 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2019-03-08 | House | Postponed on Unfinished Business, House Calendar, until 3/9/19 |
2019-03-08 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Be adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | To House Rules |
2019-03-05 | House | With amendment, be adopted, but first to Rules |
2019-03-01 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-03-01 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2019-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-02-20 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-20 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-20 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |