WV SCR4 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR4

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Congress call convention to propose amendment on congressional term limits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Congress call convention to propose amendment on congressional term limits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-22 - Senate - Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 14) (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-23HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-01-23HouseTo Judiciary
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-22SenateOrdered to House
2020-01-22SenateAdopted by Senate (Roll No. 14)
2020-01-22SenateOn Unfinished Business
2020-01-21SenateReported be adopted
2020-01-14SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-14SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-14SenateOn Unfinished Business
2020-01-13SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-13SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SCR4 (Carry Over) 2019-03-09 - Completed legislative action

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback