WV SCR39 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - To House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting creation of Joint Select Committee on Requirements Governing Water Quality Standards

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting creation of Joint Select Committee on Requirements Governing Water Quality Standards

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08HouseTo House Rules
2019-03-08HouseWith amendment, be adopted, but first to Rules
2019-03-01HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-03-01HouseTo Judiciary then Rules
2019-03-01HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-28SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-28SenateAdopted by Senate (Voice vote)
2019-02-28SenateOn Unfinished Business
2019-02-27SenateReported be adopted
2019-02-20SenateTo Rules
2019-02-20SenateTo Rules
2019-02-20SenateOn Unfinished Business
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-19SenateFiled for introduction

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback