WV SCR38 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-12 - Completed legislative action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-12 - Completed legislative action
Summary
Requesting Joint Committee on Government and Finance study needs, challenges and issues facing West Virginians with Alzheimer's
Title
Requesting Joint Committee on Government and Finance study needs, challenges and issues facing West Virginians with Alzheimer's
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | Adopted by House (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-12 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-12 | Be adopted | |
2011-03-10 | To House Rules | |
2011-03-10 | To Rules | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced in House | |
2011-03-10 | Ordered to House | |
2011-03-10 | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-10 | On Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-09 | Reported be adopted | |
2011-02-23 | To Rules | |
2011-02-23 | Reported be adopted, but first to Rules | |
2011-02-21 | To Health and Human Resources | |
2011-02-21 | To Health and Human Resources then Rules | |
2011-02-21 | On Unfinished Business | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-18 | Filed for introduction |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Resolution_History.cfm?year=2011&sessiontype=RS&input4=38&billtype=CR&houseorig=S&btype=res |