WV SCR34 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
US Army SPC Julian Lee Berisford Memorial Bridge
Title
US Army SPC Julian Lee Berisford Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Maroney [R] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] |
Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | Adopted by House (Voice vote) |
2019-03-09 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-09 | House | Reference dispensed |
2019-03-09 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2019-03-09 | House | Be adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | To House Rules |
2019-03-05 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2019-03-01 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-03-01 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2019-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-02-15 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-15 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-15 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |