WV SCR3 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
US Army MSG Richard A. "Dick" Smoot Memorial Bridge
Title
US Army MSG Richard A. "Dick" Smoot Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-07 | House | Adopted by House (Voice vote) |
2020-03-07 | House | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-07 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2020-03-07 | House | Be adopted |
2020-03-04 | House | To House Rules |
2020-03-04 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2020-01-24 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2020-01-27 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2020-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2020-01-13 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-01-13 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-01-13 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |