WV SCR22 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - To House Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - To House Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Walter E. Swiger Memorial Bridge
Title
Walter E. Swiger, Jr., Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2017-03-16 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Rules |
2017-03-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2017-02-27 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2017-02-27 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2017-02-27 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |